Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Lommel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1893BornSchleiderhof
13 Jul 191926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Luxembourg
14 May 194956.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luxembourg
14 May 194956.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nephelis
29 Jun 194956.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nephelis
21 Oct 195663.7SucceededBishop of Luxembourg
13 Feb 197178.0RetiredBishop of Luxembourg
12 Jun 197885.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Léon Lommel:
Bishop Léon Lommel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013