Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frédéric Edouard Camille Lamy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1887BornAmiens
29 Jun 191224.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 193244.9AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
29 Sep 193245.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
20 Aug 193648.9AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
27 Oct 196275.1RetiredArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
27 Oct 196275.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
10 Dec 197083.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
3 May 197688.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Edouard Camille Lamy:
Archbishop Frédéric Edouard Camille Lamy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013