Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Charles Kirmann, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sassandra, Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1887Born
10 Jul 191022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
9 Apr 194052.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sassandra, Côte d’Ivoire
9 Apr 194052.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
22 Sep 194053.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
18 Feb 195567.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sassandra, Côte d’Ivoire
25 Mar 195567.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sassandra, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Charles Kirmann
Bishop Alphonse Charles Kirmann S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sassandra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBischoffsheim, France

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast