Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Wach, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1907Born
21 Jun 193123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
9 Feb 194032.3AppointedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
26 Apr 194739.5ResignedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
9 Apr 198375.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Louis Wach
Father Louis Wach S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThanvillé, France

  • a priest for 51.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast