Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John James Howe, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Myitkyina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1912BornBallinakill, Ireland
21 Dec 193624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
18 Jul 195947.5AppointedPrefect of Bhamo, Myanmar
21 Feb 196149.1AppointedBishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
1 Jul 196149.4Ordained BishopBishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
9 Dec 197664.9ResignedBishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
7 Mar 200088.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Myitkyina, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John James Howe:
Bishop John James Howe S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Myitkyina

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Apr 2014