Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph U Win

Deceased

Archbishop of Mandalay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1901BornChanthaywa
31 Jan 192624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mandalay, Myanmar
10 Apr 195452.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
10 Apr 195452.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
18 Jul 195452.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
19 Dec 195958.1AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
29 May 196563.6DiedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John Joseph U Win:
Archbishop John Joseph U Win (born , died ) Archbishop of Mandalay

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015