Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dignan

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1880BornBallygar
6 Sep 190323.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 192443.8AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
1 Jun 192444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
12 Apr 195372.8DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Dignan:
Bishop John Dignan (born , died ) Bishop of Clonfert

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013