Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Myitkyina

Dioecesis Myitkyinaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francis Daw Tang, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 February 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mandalay
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 67,627 (26,120 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: St. Columban's, Aungnan Yeiktha, Myitkyina 01011, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (074)23.017
  • Fax: 23.016

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bhamo
5 January 1939ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Bhamo (erected)
Diocese of Myitkyina
21 February 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bhamo Diocese of Myitkyina
28 August 2006Territory LostDiocese of Myitkyina Diocese of Banmaw (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Bhamo
19503,570508,526.7%34341052618ap1951
Diocese of Myitkyina
197033,941775,0004.4%2919ap1971
198052,280821,0006.4%15153,4854018ap1981
199068,7321,028,0006.7%20203,43626819ap1991
199989,1811,500,0005.9%35352,54869425ap2000
200093,0871,600,0005.8%36362,58569625ap2001
200194,1901,600,0005.9%36362,616610325ap2002
200290,4602,000,0004.5%42422,153611023ap2003
200392,6762,000,0004.6%46462,014611726ap2004
200498,3512,000,0004.9%42422,341611927ap2005
200672,9301,545,4544.7%336391,87027017bul28aug2006

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Apr 2014