Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Taungngu

Dioecesis Tunguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Isaac Danu, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 July 1996
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Taunggyi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 49,600 (19,158 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Church Compound, Khay Mar Street, Taungngu 08101, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (054)24.297

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}
19 July 1870ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale} (erected)
27 April 1927Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kengtung (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Toungoo
27 April 1927Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Toungoo
Diocese of Toungoo
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Toungoo Diocese of Toungoo
21 March 1961Territory LostDiocese of Toungoo Diocese of Taunggyi (erected)
Diocese of Taungngu
31 July 1996Name ChangedDiocese of Toungoo Diocese of Taungngu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Toungoo
195033,8581,240,0002.7%42428069322ap1951
Diocese of Toungoo
197023,4791,000,0002.3%20201,173208410ap1971
198027,5523,132,000.9%241251,10226210ap1981
198834,4843,077,0001.1%353598559514ap1991
Diocese of Taungngu
199938,9973,260,6971.2%4343906611820ap2000
200039,2163,262,0161.2%4848817512020ap2001
200139,1303,264,1301.2%4949798412020ap2002
200239,2153,271,0001.2%5353739412020ap2003
200340,0303,300,0001.2%6363635412020ap2004
200440,0943,310,0001.2%5353756412020ap2005
201042,2803,360,0001.3%5656755412021ap2011
201442,6053,412,6051.2%5858734312022ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015