Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Stanislas La Rocque

Deceased

Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1846Born
9 May 186922.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 189346.9AppointedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
30 Nov 189347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
15 Aug 192679.8DiedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul-Stanislas La Rocque (VIAF: 304912127)
Bishop Paul-Stanislas La Rocque (born , died ) Bishop of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSte-Marie-de-Monnoir, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Ordained BishopSherbrooke, Diocese of Sherbrooke, Québec

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017