Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Osias Gagnon

Deceased

Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1860Born
8 Jul 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
23 May 192362.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
23 May 192362.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pegae
29 Jun 192362.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pegae
23 Jun 192766.5AppointedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
12 Feb 194180.1DiedBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Osias Gagnon
Bishop Alphonse-Osias Gagnon (born , died ) Bishop of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNotre-Dame de Bonsecours, Stukely-Nord

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018