Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Jude Tyson

Bishop of Yakima, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1957 Born
10 Jun 198931.6Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
12 May 200547.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
12 May 200547.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Migirpa
6 Jun 200547.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Migirpa
12 Apr 201153.4AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
31 May 201153.6InstalledBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jude Tyson
Bishop Joseph Jude Tyson (born ) Bishop of Yakima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoses Lake, WA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yakima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Bollettino, 12 Apr 2011
  • CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast