Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael James Sis

Bishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1960 Born
19 Jul 198626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Austin, Texas, USA
12 Dec 201353.9AppointedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
27 Jan 201454.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael James Sis
Bishop Michael James Sis (born ) Bishop of San Angelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMount Holly, NJ

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Angelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013
  • c1/ob: CB, 12 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 31 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast