Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Emil Goedert

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Tamazeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1927 Born
1 May 195224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
8 Jul 199163.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
8 Jul 199163.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamazeni
29 Aug 199163.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamazeni
24 Jan 200375.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond Emil Goedert
Bishop Raymond Emil Goedert (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOak Park

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,465
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast