Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Fors Olson

Bishop of Fort Worth, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1966 BornPark Ridge, IL
3 Jun 199427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
19 Nov 201347.3AppointedBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
29 Jan 201447.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Fors Olson:
Bishop Michael Fors Olson (born ) Bishop of Fort Worth

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fort Worth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,085

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015