Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre Vachon

Deceased

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1885Born
22 May 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 193954.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
11 Dec 193954.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
2 Feb 194054.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
22 May 194054.7SucceededArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
30 Mar 195367.6DiedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Vachon (VIAF: 188819737)
Archbishop Alexandre Vachon (born , died ) Archbishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Raymond

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018