Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Eugène Limoges

Deceased

Bishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1412AppointedAdministrator
16 Nov 1879BornSainte-Scholastique
20 Dec 190223.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 192242.8AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
30 Nov 192243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
24 Oct 195777.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
1 Mar 196585.2DiedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Eugène Limoges:
Archbishop Joseph-Eugène Limoges (born , died ) Bishop of Mont-Laurier

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015