Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Eli Dion, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jolo, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Caudium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1911Born
24 Jun 193624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
28 Jan 198068.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
28 Jan 198068.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caudium
23 Apr 198068.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caudium
11 Oct 199180.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
12 Feb 199987.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for George Eli Dion
Bishop George Eli Dion O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCentral Falls, RI, USA

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018