Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vicente Araña y Idígoras, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram

Titular Bishop of Siniandus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1880BornBerriz, Spain
25 Jun 190525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 Mar 193151.1AppointedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
29 Jun 193151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayapuram, India
14 Jun 194666.3ResignedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
14 Jun 194666.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Siniandus
26 Mar 195878.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram, India

MicroData Summary for Juan Vicente Araña y Idígoras:
Bishop Juan Vicente Araña y Idígoras O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015