Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese)

Trivandrensis Syrorum Malankarensium



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archeparchy
  • Erected: 11 June 1932
  • Major Archbishopric
  • Syro-Malankarese Catholic Church of the Antiochian Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 2,536 (979 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Major Archbishop's House, Pattom, Thiruvananthapuram-695004, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0471)2541.642/3
  • Fax: 2541.635

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 June 1932ErectedArcheparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
16 December 1996Territory LostArcheparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Marthandom (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
10 February 2005ElevatedArcheparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese) (became a Major-Archdiocese)
2 January 2007Territory LostArcheparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Mavelikara (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)
25 January 2010Territory LostArcheparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese) Eparchy of Pathanamthitta (Syro-Malankarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195054,5883,000,0001.8%73229557412100ap1951
1970150,4529,012,0001.7%1443417884565353152ap1971
1980195,830156371931,014878501115ap1981
1990223,62210,754,0002.1%175362111,059784641123ap1991
1998305,0008,350,0003.7%195352301,32650769143ap2002
2002250,0008,500,0002.9%208342421,03387785175ap2003
2003260,0008,520,0003.1%2115626797399838176ap2004
2004265,0008,530,0003.1%22457281943129954186ap2005
2009252,0006,020,0004.2%189422311,090118617147ap2010
2010214,4004,869,9844.4%1964424089312256754ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 2 Sep 2013