Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthew Kavukattu

Deceased

Archbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1904BornPravithanam
21 Dec 193531.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 195046.0AppointedBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
9 Nov 195046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Dec 195046.4InstalledBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
29 Jul 195652.0AppointedArchbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
9 Oct 196965.2DiedArchbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Matthew Kavukattu:
Archbishop Matthew Kavukattu (born , died ) Archbishop of Changanacherry

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013