Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Michel-Marie Fée, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1856BornAmbrières-le-Grand, France
8 Mar 187923.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Jul 189640.5AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
22 Nov 189640.8Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
20 Jan 190448.0DiedBishop of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for René-Michel-Marie Fée:
Bishop René-Michel-Marie Fée M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Malacca

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013