Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Dépierre, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1855Born
20 Sep 187924.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Apr 189540.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
12 Apr 189540.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
25 Jul 189540.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
17 Oct 189843.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Dépierre (VIAF: 17213077)
Bishop Jean-Marie Dépierre M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThoiry, France
Ordained BishopSaigon

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017