Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph-Louis-Abel Gilbert

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

Titular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1849Born
21 Sep 187223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limoges, France
29 Jan 189444.4SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
18 May 189444.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
15 Jul 189444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
24 Mar 189848.5ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
24 Mar 189848.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
5 Jul 191464.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph-Louis-Abel Gilbert (VIAF: 305400557)
Bishop Charles-Joseph-Louis-Abel Gilbert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Michel-des-Lions, Diocese of Limoges
Ordained BishopCathedral, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017