Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Gustave Lacointe

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1899Born
20 Dec 192425.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 192526.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 195555.9AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
7 May 195556.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
23 Apr 196566.0DiedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Gustave Lacointe (VIAF: 5013115)
Bishop Pierre-Marie Gustave Lacointe (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuville-Ferrières, Archdiocese of Rouen
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceLausanne, Diocese of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 29
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast