Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Henri Joseph Fontenelle

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Theudalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1894Born
22 Dec 192329.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cambrai, France
28 Jun 192429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
25 Mar 195560.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Theudalis
5 Jun 195560.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theudalis
27 Mar 195762.2DiedTitular Bishop of Theudalis

MicroData Summary for René Henri Joseph Fontenelle (VIAF: 63663450)
Bishop René Henri Joseph Fontenelle (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Theudalis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaubeuge, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLe Mans, Diocese of Le Mans, France

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1958
  • bp: CB, 7 Aug 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 42
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast