Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Edward Hyland

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Atlanta, Georgia

Titular Bishop of Bisica


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1901BornPhiladelphia
11 Jun 192725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Oct 194948.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Savannah-Atlanta, Georgia, USA
15 Oct 194948.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gomphi
21 Dec 194948.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gomphi
17 Jul 195654.8AppointedBishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
8 Nov 195655.1InstalledBishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
11 Oct 196160.0ResignedBishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
11 Oct 196160.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
31 Jan 196866.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Edward Hyland:
Bishop Francis Edward Hyland (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Atlanta

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013