Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William M. Slattery, C.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Mission


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1895Born
8 Jun 191924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
194751.6AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Mission
196872.6ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Mission
10 Aug 198287.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Mission

MicroData Summary for William M. Slattery:
Father William M. Slattery C.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Mission

  • a priest for 63.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015