Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Thomas Daley

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1915Born
7 Jun 194125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Nov 196347.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Nov 196347.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
7 Jan 196448.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
31 Jul 196751.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Oct 197155.8SucceededBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Sep 198367.6DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Thomas Daley
Bishop Joseph Thomas Daley (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConnerton

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017