Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Jerome Welsh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1921Born
30 May 194624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Feb 197048.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Feb 197048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
2 Apr 197048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
4 Jun 197452.4AppointedBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
13 Aug 197452.6InstalledBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
3 Feb 198361.1AppointedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Mar 198361.2InstalledBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Dec 199775.9ResignedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Feb 200987.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Jerome Welsh
Bishop Thomas Jerome Welsh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allentown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeatherly

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017