Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Gorordo y Perfecto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Tacapae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1862Born
31 May 188523.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 190947.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
29 Apr 190947.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
24 Jun 190947.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
15 Dec 190947.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cebu, Philippines
2 Apr 191047.9AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
2 Jul 191048.2InstalledBishop of Cebu, Philippines
19 Jun 193169.1ResignedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
19 Jun 193169.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
20 Dec 193472.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Gorordo y Perfecto
Bishop Juan Bautista Gorordo y Perfecto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarili

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 35
  • ln: CB, 3 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast