Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Singzon y Baeza (de la Anunciacion)

Deceased

Bishop of Calbayog, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1851Born
24 Feb 187726.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 191059.2AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
12 Jun 191059.3Ordained BishopBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
9 Aug 192069.5DiedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pablo Singzon y Baeza (de la Anunciacion)
Bishop Pablo Singzon y Baeza (de la Anunciacion) (born , died ) Bishop of Calbayog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalbiga

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 103
  • ln: CB, 4 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast