Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Leo Leech

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Allegheny


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1890Born
29 May 192030.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 193545.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
6 Jul 193545.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mela
17 Oct 193545.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mela
19 Dec 193545.5AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Oct 197181.4RetiredBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Oct 197181.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Allegheny
12 Mar 198594.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for George Leo Leech
Bishop George Leo Leech (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAshley

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018