Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene Joseph McGuinness

Deceased

Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1889BornHellertown
22 May 191525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Oct 193748.1AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
21 Dec 193748.3Ordained BishopBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
11 Nov 194455.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
11 Nov 194455.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ilium
10 Jan 194555.3InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
1 Feb 194858.4SucceededBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
27 Dec 195768.3DiedBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Eugene Joseph McGuinness:
Bishop Eugene Joseph McGuinness (born , died ) Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013