Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Crochet

Deceased

Bishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1844Born
22 May 186925.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 190056.6AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
10 Feb 190156.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
6 Jun 190359.1DiedBishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Crochet
Bishop Jean-Marie Crochet (born , died ) Bishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChilly, France

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast