Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Cuter, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1940Born
4 Oct 195818.1Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Oct 196121.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Mar 196625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jan 199857.4AppointedBishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil
19 Mar 199857.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil
7 Dec 201676.3RetiredBishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil
28 Sep 201979.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Franco Cuter
Bishop Franco Cuter O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grajaú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGazzaniga, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained PriestSant’Ambrogio, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopAtrium, Cathedral, Grajaú, Diocese of Grajaú, Maranhão
Death PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,255
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • d: CB, 29 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast