Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Fennelly

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Madras

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1841AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
30 Apr 1841AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
27 Jun 1841Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
23 Jan 1868DiedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India

MicroData Summary for John Fennelly:
Bishop John Fennelly (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Madras

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013