Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Francesco Delrio

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1865BornSilanus
17 Mar 188822.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 190641.4AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
24 Feb 190741.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
16 Dec 192055.4AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
5 May 192155.8InstalledArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
5 May 193872.8DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Francesco Delrio:
Archbishop Giorgio Francesco Delrio (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013