Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Spila, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1846BornSubiaco
26 Aug 186619.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Feb 187023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 190356.4AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
10 May 190356.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
29 Apr 190962.5ResignedBishop of Alatri, Italy
29 Apr 190962.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
25 Sep 192881.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Spila:
Bishop Benedetto Spila O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013