Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giocondo (Matthaeus) de Nittis, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1838Born
13 Jun 185921.2ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
23 Feb 186122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
7 Jun 188648.1AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
13 Jun 188648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
28 Feb 190869.9DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giocondo (Matthaeus) de Nittis (VIAF: 89118697)
Bishop Giocondo (Matthaeus) de Nittis O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni Rotondo, Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste)
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017