Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Canali, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1836BornParma
12 Dec 185317.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1889²52.9AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
1897²60.9ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
3 Aug 190165.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
18 Aug 190165.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
22 Apr 190569.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Canali:
Archbishop Luigi Canali O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 471
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013