Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Arcangeli

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1833Born
22 Dec 185522.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189865.7AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
8 Dec 189865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
6 Feb 190975.9DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Arcangeli (VIAF: 88628759)
Bishop Giacinto Arcangeli (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarnico, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopFilles du S. Coeur-via Cavour, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017