Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Finbarr Francis Broderick

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1868BornHartford, CT
26 Jul 189627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
16 Sep 190334.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Sep 190334.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
28 Oct 190334.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
1 Mar 190536.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Nov 194374.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure Finbarr Francis Broderick:
Bishop Bonaventure Finbarr Francis Broderick (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013