Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino (Raffaele) Zini, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1825Born
27 Aug 184822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
11 Feb 188963.1AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
25 Mar 188963.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
19 May 189266.4DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino (Raffaele) Zini (VIAF: 89540121)
Archbishop Celestino (Raffaele) Zini Sch. P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSala Ducale, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017