Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Boschi

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1853BornPotenza Picena
9 Jun 190248.8AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
11 Jun 190248.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
25 Jul 191057.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
27 Nov 191158.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
20 Jan 192470.5DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Boschi:
Bishop Luigi Boschi (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 484
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013