Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Bausa, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1821Born
24 Mar 184524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 May 188766.2Elevated to Cardinal
26 May 188766.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
11 Feb 188967.9AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
14 Feb 188967.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
24 Mar 188968.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
15 Apr 189978.1DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Bausa (VIAF: 3347448)
Agostino Cardinal Bausa O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained PriestCarthusian, Monastery, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSala Ducale, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Buried Place (Original)Provisional Chapel, Mercy, Cemetery, Soffiano, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Buried Place (Current)Grand Chapel, Mercy, Cemetery, Soffiano, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 272, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 May 1887
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017