Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Régine

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1856BornForio d’Ischia
9 Jun 190246.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nicastro, Italy
9 Jun 190246.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
11 Jun 190246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
4 Oct 190246.7AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
6 Dec 191559.9AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
4 Oct 191862.7DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Régine:
Archbishop Giovanni Régine (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,416
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 125, and Page 407
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013