Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Maiello

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1862Born
7 Jun 188422.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189937.8AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
17 Dec 189937.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
8 Mar 190644.0DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Maiello (VIAF: 89752064)
Bishop Cristoforo Maiello (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAprano, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopSt. Martin au Mont, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017