Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Lualdi

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1858BornMilano
30 Oct 188022.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Nov 190446.3AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
4 Dec 190446.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Apr 190748.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190748.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
12 Nov 192769.3DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Lualdi:
Cardinal Alessandro Lualdi (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 67
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013