Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bac Ninh

Dioecesis Bacninhensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Cosme Hoàng Van Dat, S.J., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hà Nôi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 24,600 (9,501 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.giaophanbacninh.org/
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, 537 Ngo Gia Tu, Tx. Bac Ninh, Tinh Bac Ninh, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (0241)3821.438
  • Fax: 3824.843

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}
1 June 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bac Ninh
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Yünnan
Vicariate Apostolic of Bac Ninh
Diocese of Bac Ninh
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bac Ninh Diocese of Bac Ninh

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bac Ninh
194958,0001,100,0005.3%6510757731119048ap1951
Diocese of Bac Ninh
196335,4236175,0602448ap1971
197972,00051612,0002346ap1991
1999112,2136,828,9001.6%101011,22126946ap2000
2000114,4586,965,4781.6%101011,4453152ap2001
2001115,8247,648,3681.5%101011,58231281ap2002
2003117,1437,724,8511.5%19196,16532281ap2004
2004123,0906,909,2961.8%23235,35129947ap2005
2006131,8157,181,4091.8%28284,70730646ap2007
2012125,0008,061,0001.6%505552,272716785ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013